Trustees YMCA CENTRES (SOUTH MOLTON)

Charity number: 1165990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jane Eleanor Lucas Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Rita Tracey Nardone Trustee 09 September 2021
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
YMCA EXETER COMMUNITY PROJECTS
Received: On time
Kenneth Albert Williams Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
Glenys Mary Laws Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
Rachel Ann Williams Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
William Thomas McDermid Trustee 02 October 2017
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
YMCA EXETER COMMUNITY PROJECTS
Received: On time
HEATHER WARREN Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
IAN DAVID AWCOCK Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record