Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SUTTON COURTENAY PRIMARY

Charity number: 1165543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 October 2018 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required