Accounts and annual returns CHANGE A CHAPTER

Charity number: 1169249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 16 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window