Financial history CHANGE A CHAPTER

Charity number: 1169249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £16.62k £18.60k £23.58k £24.73k £23.38k
Total expenditure £16.79k £18.97k £19.88k £23.68k £24.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A