Financial history LEICESTER SOUTH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1166104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £17.16k £81.93k £152.04k £398.57k £642.54k
Total expenditure £9.66k £45.36k £114.21k £316.82k £490.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.00k £58.79k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £294.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £347.71k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £347.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £143.27k