FRIENDS OF BURY MUSIC CENTRE

Charity number: 507538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.66k £14.71k £12.51k £16.80k £8.78k
Total expenditure £14.84k £11.38k £8.18k £19.64k £10.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A