THE ARTS SOCIETY KINGSTON

Charity number: 1168151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required