Financial history CITY DISABILITIES

Charity number: 1166822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/06/2018 20/06/2019 20/06/2020 20/06/2021 20/06/2022
Total gross income £9.10k £13.00k £10.00k £9.19k £11.46k
Total expenditure £12.44k £11.58k £11.82k £10.94k £11.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A