Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST DAVID'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 September 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 September 2022 449 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 September 2022 814 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 September 2022 1180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required