SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507582
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)