Accounts and annual returns CLUBLAND

Charity number: 507641
Charity reporting is overdue by 1667 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 571 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 936 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 936 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1301 days
Annual return 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1667 days