THE PORTHILL PLAYERS AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1167924
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 May 2021 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 12 May 2021 377 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 January 2020 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 January 2020 261 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 31 May 2018 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 01 June 2018 32 days late Download