Financial history ASPERGER'S CHILDREN AND CARERS TOGETHER

Charity number: 1169099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £146.18k £101.21k £154.47k £181.04k £206.14k
Total expenditure £107.09k £122.98k £136.30k £140.59k £161.96k
Income from government contracts £45.00k £45.00k £45.00k £52.77k £52.80k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.53k £13.70k