NEWBY AND SCALBY LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1168661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.76k £36.53k £47.20k £39.85k £34.71k
Total expenditure £17.40k £14.91k £36.91k £43.10k £13.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £0 N/A £850 £20.66k