UNITY IN DIVERSITY (SWANSEA 2015)

Charity number: 1167339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 July 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 23 July 2020 114 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 10 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 10 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download