UNITY IN DIVERSITY (SWANSEA 2015)

Charity number: 1167339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carlos Isarra Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Kristina Krasnova Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Saba Humayan Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Terryl Lynn Lewis Trustee 04 October 2017 None on record
Mark Farrell Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
Jill Boggs Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
Julianne Morgan Trustee 15 August 2015 None on record
Debra White Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
DAVID BROWELL Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
Roslyn Anne Bevan Trustee 07 December 2016 None on record
ADELLA PRITCHARD Chair 28 November 2019 None on record