BIDBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL - CIO

Charity number: 1166337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 November 2017 On time Download