Financial history SKYANGELS AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1168225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020 30/05/2021
Total gross income £17.51k £10.13k £45.26k £64.50k £66.00k
Total expenditure £41.30k £9.91k £44.25k £61.68k £65.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A