Financial history THE DAILY MILE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.48k £116.40k £150.50k £151.41k £151.41k
Total expenditure £36.35k £104.71k £169.79k £119.29k £119.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A