Trustees GREATER MANCHESTER LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1170317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arwa Graf Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Ciara Bartlam Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Lamin Touray Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Ben Clay Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Andrew Kevin Walsh Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
Craig Holmes Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
KEVIN ALLSOP Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
Aisha Khan Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
GILES ELLIOTT Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
DENISE MCDOWELL Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record
SUKHDEEP SINGH Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record