BRAMBLEBROOK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1167681
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2018 On time Download