BRAMBLEBROOK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1167681
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS A JUPP Trustee 13 July 2016 None on record
MRS C PICKFORD Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Mr S Thacker Chair 30 March 2017 None on record
MRS R FOZARD Trustee 05 May 2016 None on record
MRS N SALISBURY ROOD Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
CLARE PENTER Trustee 22 March 2016 None on record