Financial history ROCK AROUND THE HILLS

Charity number: 1166138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £35.45k £0 £30.53k £0 £0
Total expenditure £444 £34.30k £31.42k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £30.53k N/A N/A