Trustees HOMESHARE INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1170332

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Snider | Chair | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ALICE FRANCIS | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Desaintbon | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sibel Whitehead | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Weizi | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Regis De Kerauen | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERIS JEAN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIRBY A DUNN | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MILLS OBE | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|||||
CYRIL CHRISTOPHER WOOD FCA | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.