Financial history COMPASSIONATE COMMUNITIES UK

Charity number: 1167511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £12.62k £100.01k £304.84k £33.35k £57.78k
Total expenditure £12.62k £51.13k £197.50k £69.87k £85.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £304.77k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.62k N/A N/A N/A N/A