Financial history 4THECHILDREN

Charity number: 1166434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £62.65k £22.20k £21.57k £11.51k £6.07k
Total expenditure £51.54k £15.63k £12.65k £7.79k £5.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A