CANOLFAN DEULUOL TREGARON

Charity number: 1168620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £38.76k £50.87k £51.45k £36.17k £47.06k
Total expenditure £26.75k £50.19k £38.45k £53.77k £22.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.33k
Income from government grants £2.00k £1.40k £625 £825 £10.00k