THE WELSH SCHOOLS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1167479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Ellis Robinson Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Jonathan Wright Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record
Margaret Eiri Jones Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Mrs A C Batey Trustee 04 July 2017
RADNOR WALK CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL Received: On time
MARGARET TUDOR JONES Trustee 27 November 2013
THE MACHYNLLETH TABERNACLE TRUST Received: On time
CEREDIG THOMAS Trustee 16 December 2016 None on record
GLENYS ROBERTS Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Sian Elin Hughes Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record