YOUBELONG

Charity number: 1169229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 March 2018 On time Download