Financial history MOVE THE WORLD

Charity number: 1170656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £28.54k £70.66k £52.86k £31.38k
Total expenditure £0 £33.11k £47.65k £47.03k £34.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A