Financial history APRIL TRUST

Charity number: 1170020
Charity reporting is overdue by 486 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £947 £15.53k £866.66k £866.66k £20.94k
Total expenditure £318.00k £277.96k £228.77k £152.79k £131.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £866.66k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £866.66k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £224.26k £149.40k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £990 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £3.52k £3.39k N/A