Accounts and annual returns Vulnerable Persons Interventions
Charity number: 1170330

Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2018 | 27 February 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window