Financial history Vulnerable Persons Interventions

Charity number: 1170330
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020 30/10/2021
Total gross income £5.38k £266 £0 £0 £9.00k
Total expenditure £4.85k £1.42k £6.81k £18.18k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A