RYE AND DISTRICT STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1168298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 August 2018 On time Download