Trustees ICUSTEPS
Charity number: 1169162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN PESKETT | Chair | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Latham | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Charles Bastin | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Young | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Saha | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pam Ramsay | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monica Trivedi | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Page | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Davis | Trustee | 04 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTINA JONES | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHIL SMITH | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER GIBB | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.