THE GURU NANAK NISHKAM SEWAK JATHA (BIRMINGHAM) UK

Charity number: 508470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time Download