Dogfen lywodraethu THE HEREFORD DIOCESAN GUILD OF BELLRINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 13 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 1999 as amended on 06 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND SHALL BE:- (A) TO ASSIST BELL RESTORATION, INSTALLATION AND AUGMENTATION IN THE DIOCESE, AND THE CHURCHES OF NEW RADNOR, GLASBURY, TALGARTH, WELSHPOOL AND KNIGHTON, (THE ELIGIBLE CHURCHES), BY MEANS OF MONETARY GRANTS. (B) TO ACQUIRE, BY PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE, BELLS, FRAMES AND FITTINGS WHICH MAY BECOME REDUNDANT OR OTHERWISE BE AVAILABLE, WITH A VIEW TO HAVING THEM INSTALLED IN ELIGIBLE CHURCHES. (C) TO PURCHASE, PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND EXHIBIT BELLS FROM WITHIN THE DIOCESE, WHICH ARE CONSIDERED OF HISTORIC OR OTHER IMPORTANCE.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.