Financial history UKRAINIAN INSTITUTE LONDON

Charity number: 1170753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £66.64k £66.82k £88.05k £63.68k £200.27k
Total expenditure £45.78k £57.77k £61.76k £70.52k £158.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A