Accounts and annual returns ZENITH YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1169585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 September 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2021 07 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 September 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 September 2019 14 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2019 14 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 September 2018 02 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2018 02 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 September 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window