Financial history WENSLEYDALE CONCERT SERIES

Charity number: 1172472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.76k £9.72k £6.71k £7.43k £9.00k
Total expenditure £4.61k £8.41k £8.03k £21 £6.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A