SAMARITANS OF IPSWICH AND EAST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1168725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £123.09k £137.03k £111.96k £101.74k £87.75k
Total expenditure £124.39k £122.55k £119.66k £148.17k £78.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.74k £0 N/A N/A £19.86k