SAMARITANS OF IPSWICH AND EAST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1168725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Elizabeth Riley Trustee 08 July 2019
CONCORD VIDEO AND FILM COUNCIL LIMITED Received: On time
SUFFOLK ARCHIVES FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORTHGATE FOUNDATION Received: On time
NICOLA INGE BEACH Trustee 08 July 2019 None on record
Steven Alder Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
COLIN STUART Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
ALISON REEVE Trustee 27 January 2021 None on record
TIMOTHY PATRICK EATON HAMMOND Trustee 08 July 2019 None on record
Rev JANE CASSIDY Trustee 22 June 2017 None on record
Sean Kevin Coulter Trustee 01 February 2020 None on record
Martin Le Corre Trustee 22 February 2021 None on record