Financial history DOVECOTE VOLUNTARY PARENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1172048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £35.89k £60.37k £73.32k £87.61k £50.96k
Total expenditure £51.76k £73.05k £88.24k £49.73k £51.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £8.00k £9.50k N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £26.33k £19.31k N/A £6.39k