Financial history CITY & EAST LONDON BEREAVEMENT SERVICE

Charity number: 1169797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £151.05k £66.65k £27.98k £58.13k £43.81k
Total expenditure £117.28k £63.42k £33.45k £45.86k £87.02k
Income from government contracts £80.92k £39.32k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k N/A