BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT

Charity number: 508669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £673.58k £738.14k £987.19k £1.06m £535.92k
Total expenditure £547.11k £837.69k £893.45k £1.01m £813.59k
Income from government contracts £108.77k £237.10k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £182.13k £170.99k £657.57k £201.01k £208.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £48.64k £45.85k £68.94k £52.85k £21.66k
Income - Other trading activities £20.99k £19.91k £10.98k £16.95k £8.70k
Income - Charitable activities £603.79k £672.28k £907.27k £991.57k £505.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £161 £100 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £521.28k £801.16k £862.26k £969.84k £438.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £25.83k £36.52k £31.20k £35.53k £12.72k
Expenditure - Governance £30.73k £25.49k £24.25k £44.13k £16.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £362.57k