AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1169279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £32.84k £25.77k £28.51k £39.00k £226.47k
Total expenditure £26.84k £21.84k £26.82k £32.17k £110.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.84k £0 N/A N/A N/A