WESLEY CENTRE, HARROGATE

Charity number: 1168825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donald Lighton Rolls Trustee 01 September 2020
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Sharon Wright Trustee 15 November 2018
GRACIOUS STREET METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
LESLIE SUDRON Trustee 01 September 2014
THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ORGANISATION Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Eleanor Jeanette Borkett Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Rev Lesley Ann Taylor Trustee 01 September 2020
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH BUNTING B ED Trustee 01 September 2014
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
GEOFFREY RUNCORN Trustee 01 September 2014
HAROLD STYAN CHARITY FOR YOUTH Received: On time
Rev Benjamin Paul Clowes Chair 01 September 2017
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Michael Greenberg Trustee 01 September 2014
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ORGANISATION Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Victoria Wheatley Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Edward Walton Trustee 13 March 2019
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Rev John Trevor Dixon Trustee 01 September 2014
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Judith Ann Yeats Trustee 01 September 2019
WESLEY CHAPEL (HARROGATE) Received: On time
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Rev Christopher Charles Clayton Trustee 01 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HIGH HARROGATE Received: On time