Financial history THE HAVEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1169747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £182.42k £104.79k £155.25k £155.25k £179.62k
Total expenditure £164.10k £172.44k £158.00k £159.76k £159.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k N/A N/A N/A £25.00k