Trustees THE HAVEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1169747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tribhuwan Prasad Singh Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Carolyn Mann Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Jacqueline Stone Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Aurelia Jude Love Milner Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record
KAORU MAGEE Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record