CAMBRIDGE & COLERIDGE ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1169959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 March 2019 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 March 2019 33 days late Download